|
22.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2011 |
|
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
31 |
|
26.04.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.03.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.11.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
7 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
07.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
23 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Request for change of name |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
29.11.2004 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.11.2002 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.09.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.09.2002 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |