EP1396035 - SOLAR CONCENTRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Liège Interface Entreprises-Université Avenue Pré-Aily 4 4031 Angleur / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Université de Liège Interface Entreprises-Université Avenue Pré-Aily, 4 4031 Angleur / BE | ||
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states Université de Liège Antheunis Nicole Interface Entreprises-Université Avenue Pré-Aily, 4 4031 Angleur / BE | ||
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states University of Liege Interface Entreprises-Université, Quai Van Beneden, 25 4020 Liège / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABRAKEN, Serge Géromont, 141 B-4170 Comblain-au-Pont / BE | 02 /
DEFISE, Jean-Marc Heid du Moulin 22 B-4122 Plainevaux / BE | 03 /
COLLETTE, Jean-Paul avenue E.Ysaye, 16a B-4063 Embourg / BE | [2004/11] | Application number, filing date | 02740626.3 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002EP05561 | Priority number, date | EP20010201938 | 23.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01201938 | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095838 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1396035 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1396035 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/052, F24J2/08, F24J2/16 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
H01L31/0547 (EP,US);
F24S23/30 (EP,US);
F24S23/77 (EP,US);
H01L31/0543 (EP,US);
F24S2023/834 (EP,US);
F24S2023/872 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARKONZENTRATOR | [2004/11] | English: | SOLAR CONCENTRATOR | [2004/11] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR SOLAIRE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | CH | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | IT | 09.01.2008 | LI | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | DE | 10.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | ES | 20.04.2008 | GB | 17.05.2008 | LU | 17.05.2008 | IE | 19.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
GB | 17.05.2008 | ||
LU | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
GB | 17.05.2008 | ||
LU | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
GB | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
GB | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
GB | 17.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DE | 10.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2605127 (UNISEARCH LTD) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 9, line 6; figures 1-6 *; | [X]FR2404306 (LABO ELECTRONIQUE PHYSIQUE [FR]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0079062 (PICO SAVAC INC [US]) [A] 1,11,12 * page 5, line 31 - page 8, line 1; figures 1-7 *; | [X]FR2549242 (OPTHRA [FR]) [X] 1,5 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 28 * * page 7, line 11 - line 17 * * page 13, line 32 - page 16, line 13; figures 8-10 *; | [A]US4723535 (LEW HYOK S [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 54 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-18 *; | [X]WO9004142 (SOLAR ENERGY APPLIC INC [US]) [X] 1-5,11 * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 24; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US4964713 (GOETZBERGER ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 21; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9611501 (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 5, line 19 - page 7, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [DA] - COLLARES-PEREIRA ET AL, "LENS-MIRROR COMBINATIONS WITH MAXIMAL CONCENTRATION", APPLIED OPTICS., OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA,WASHINGTON., US, (197710), vol. 16, no. 10, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 2677 - 2683, XP002215675 [DA] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.16.002677 |