|
13.02.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
21.05.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
08.05.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.05.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.01.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.05.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.04.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
04.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
06.11.2003 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.09.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
30.09.2002 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.09.2002 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.09.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2002 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
16.08.2002 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
30.05.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |