EP1399265 - ELECTROSTATIC ATOMISATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aerstream Technology Limited Mulberry House, Osborne Road Wokingham RG40 1TL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Aerstream Technology Limited Mulberry House, Osborne Road Wokingham RG40 1TL / GB | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Aerstream Technology Limited The Hart Partnership, 24 High Street Saffron Walden, Essex CB10 1AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIRRIE, Alastair, Bruce 91 Plantation Road Oxford OX2 6JE / GB | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02743375.4 | 20.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002GB02900 | Priority number, date | GB20010015355 | 22.06.2001 Original published format: GB 0115355 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03000431 | Date: | 03.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399265 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399265 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05B5/025, B05B5/053, A61L9/04, A61L9/12 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
B05B5/1691 (EP,US);
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B05B5/0255 (EP,US);
B05B5/0533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHER ZERSTAEUBER | [2004/13] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC ATOMISATION DEVICE | [2004/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ATOMISATION ELECTROSTATIQUE | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | BE | 29.12.2004 | FI | 29.12.2004 | TR | 29.12.2004 | DK | 29.03.2005 | CY | 20.06.2005 | LU | 20.06.2005 | MC | 30.06.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
CY | 20.06.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
LU | 30.06.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
TR | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
MC | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
DK | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
BE | 29.12.2004 | ||
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
FI | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4581675 (KELLY ARNOLD J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5503335 (NOAKES TIMOTHY J [GB], et al) [Y] 20 * column 8, lines 54-59 *; | [Y]WO9610331 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [Y] 23 * abstract *; | [A]EP0853980 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5810265 (CORNELIUS GAY JOYCE [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5927618 (JEFFERIES ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0035524 (ELECTROSOLS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,19,22,24,25 * abstract * * page 5, lines 16-18 * * claim 41 * [Y] 20,23; | [A]US6135369 (PRENDERGAST MAURICE JOSEPH [GB], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * |