EP1520142 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING PARTICULATE MATERIAL AND COMPONENTS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gradmatic Equipment INC. P.O. Box 504 Bala, Muskoka, Ontario P0C 1A0 / CA | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRADY, Ayton, J. P.O. Box 504 Bala, Muskoka, Ontario P0C 1A0 / CA | [2005/14] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Davies, Gregory Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | ||
Former [2005/14] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 02744996.6 | 03.07.2002 | [2005/14] | WO2002CA01002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005821 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1520142 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1520142 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/16, B22D41/02 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
B65B1/12 (EP,US);
B22D41/023 (EP,US);
B65B1/28 (EP,US);
F27D1/1626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/43] |
Former [2005/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERTEILUNG VON KÖRNIGEM MATERIAL UND KOMPONENTEN DAFÜR | [2005/14] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING PARTICULATE MATERIAL AND COMPONENTS THEREFOR | [2005/14] | French: | APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION DE MATIERES PARTICULAIRES ET COMPOSANTS | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 04.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]US5058776 (COURTNEY MICHAEL L [CA], et al) [DX] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 17,23-26; | [YA]JPS63154258 ; | [YA]US5101961 (BENGTSON K ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 17 * the whole document * [A] 3,8,14,28 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881104), vol. 012, no. 416, Database accession no. (M - 759), & JP63154258 A 19880627 (KAWASAKI REFRACT CO LTD) [Y] 23-26 * abstract * [A] 6,18 |