EP1410094 - SCANNING APPARATUS FOR FORMING IMAGES IN THE MICROWAVE, MM-WAVE OR INFRARED SPECTRAL RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Farran Technology Limited Ballincollig Industrial Estate Ballincollig, County Cork / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Farran Technology Limited Ballincollig Industrial Estate Ballincollig Cork / IE | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Farran Technology Limited Ballincollig Industrial Estate Ballincollig Cork / IE | ||
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Lettington, Alan H. 5 Crosfields Close Reading, Berkshire RG2 9AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lettington, Alan H. 5 Crosfields Close Reading, Berkshire RG2 9AY / GB | [2006/01] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
* * * | ||
Former [2004/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Carstairs, James Campbell Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Carstairs, J. C. Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02745676.3 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002GB03382 | Priority number, date | GB20010018242 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: GB 0118242 | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03012524 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1410094 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1410094 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/12, H04N3/09 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
H04N3/09 (EP,US);
G02B26/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCAN-EINRICHTUNG ZUR BILDERZEUGUNG IM MIKROWELLEN-, MILLIMETERWELLEN-, ODER INFRAROT-SPEKTRALBEREICH | [2004/17] | English: | SCANNING APPARATUS FOR FORMING IMAGES IN THE MICROWAVE, MM-WAVE OR INFRARED SPECTRAL RANGE | [2004/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE BALAYAGE DESTINE A FORMER DES IMAGES DANS LE DOMAINE SPECTRAL DES MICRO-ONDES, DES ONDES MM OU DES INFRAROUGES | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 11.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.04.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   21.04.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2006 | BE | 27.09.2006 | CH | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | LI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | DK | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | PT | 13.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CY | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
DK | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CH | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
BE | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SE | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2070460 (ERNEST TRAUB) [A] 9 * figure 3 *; | [XY]US4487473 (HATCH MARCUS R [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * column 1, line 5 - line 40 * * column 3, line 20 - line 45; figure 5 * [Y] 5; | [X]US5198919 (REEDER ROBIN A [US]) [X] 1,9 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 48; figure 1 *; | [AY] - LETTINGTON A H ET AL, "OPTO-MECHANICAL SCANNERS FOR PASSIVE MILLIMETER-WAVE IMAGING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (200004), vol. 4032, pages 74 - 80, XP001105618 [A] 1-4,6-11 * the whole document * [Y] 5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.391822 | Examination | US4037920 |