EP1406069 - ELECTROSTATIC CAPACITANCE SENSOR AND FINGERPRINT COLLATOR COMPRISING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANO, Motoyasu, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIOKA, Masaki, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
SHINOZAKI, Keiichi, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02745842.1 | 04.07.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002JP06814 | Priority number, date | JP20010211796 | 12.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001211796 | [2004/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03006925 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406069 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24, G01R27/26, G01B7/28, G06K9/00, A61B5/117 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G06V40/1306 (EP,KR,US);
G01D5/24 (KR);
G06V40/1365 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTATISCHER KAPAZITÄTSSENSOR UND FINGERABDRUCKKOLLATIONSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2004/15] | English: | ELECTROSTATIC CAPACITANCE SENSOR AND FINGERPRINT COLLATOR COMPRISING IT | [2004/15] | French: | CAPTEUR DE CAPACITANCE ELECTROSTATIQUE ET DISPOSITIF DE RECUEIL D'EMPREINTE COMPRENANT CE CAPTEUR | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | Translation filed | 06.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 26.01.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63159746 (WATANABE KENZO, et al); | [A]JPS6461669 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH03237594 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD); | [A]DE4340472 (GRIESHABER VEGA KG [DE]); | [A]US5451940 (SCHNEIDER GEORG [DE], et al); | [A]JPH11326409 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2000065664 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2000213908 (SONY CORP) |