EP1407572 - MULTI-CHANNEL COMMUNICATIONS TRANSCEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vativ Technologies, Inc. 9339 Genesee Avenue, Suite 130 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Vativ Technologies, Inc. 4350 Executive Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHAVAN, Sreen, A. 8360 Prestwick Drive La Jolla, CA 92038 / US | 02 /
MANICKAM, Thulasinath, G. 10660 Bernabe Drive San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
SALLAWAY, Peter, J. 8178 Avenida Navidad, 23 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
TAYLOR, Gerard, E. 2 Salts Spray Drive Laguna Nigel, CA 92677 / US | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Schurack, Eduard F., et al ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Schurack, Eduard F., et al Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02748158.9 | 08.07.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002US22339 | Priority number, date | US20010904432 | 11.07.2001 Original published format: US 904432 | US20010965242 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: US 965242 | US20020071771 | 06.02.2002 Original published format: US 71771 | US20020167158 | 10.06.2002 Original published format: US 167158 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03007564 | Date: | 23.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1407572 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/06 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H04L27/2601 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDER/EMPFÄNGER FÜR MEHRKANALVERMITTLUNG | [2004/16] | English: | MULTI-CHANNEL COMMUNICATIONS TRANSCEIVER | [2004/16] | French: | EMETTEUR-RECEPTEUR DE COMMUNICATIONS MULTICANAUX | [2004/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 08.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0554056 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,12-22,24,26-40,43-52,54,57,82,83,111,112,117,118,120-165 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - line 43 * * column 7, line 38 - line 5 * * column 12, line 42 - column 13, line 4 * * claims 1,2 *[A] 9-11,23,25,41,42,53,55,56,58-81,84-110,113-116,119; | [XA]US5796783 (CRAWFORD JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-8,12-22,24,26-40,43-52,54,57,82,83,111,112,117,118,120-165 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - line 51 * * column 4, line 29 - line 46 * * column 5, line 21 - line 31 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 7 * [A] 9-11,23,25,41,42,53,55,56,58-81,84-110,113-116,119; | [XA]WO9945683 (KESTREL SOLUTIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,12-22,24,26-40,43-52,54,57,82,83,111,112,117,118,120-165 * abstract * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 4 * * page 8, line 22 - line 27 * * page 9, line 17 - line 24 * * claim 1 * [A] 9-11,23,25,41,42,53,55,56,58-81,84-110,113-116,119; | [XA]US5999575 (TANAKA RYOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,12-22,24,26-40,43-52,54,57,82,83,111,112,117,118,120-165 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 8 * * column 19, line 1 - line 53 * * column 22, line 43 - line 50 * [A] 9-11,23,25,41,42,53,55,56,58-81,84-110,113-116,119; | [XA]US6246664 (BOEHM MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-8,12-22,24,26-40,43-52,54,57,82,83,111,112,117,118,120-165 * abstract * * figure 7 * * column 1, line 10 - line 19 * * claim 1 * [A] 9-11,23,25,41,42,53,55,56,58-81,84-110,113-116,119 | Examination | - SCHMIDL T.M. ET AL, "Robust Frequency and Timing Synchronization for OFDM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (199712), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 1613 - 1621, XP011009085 |