EP1399192 - CONJUGATES OF POLYSACCHARIDE POLYMERS OF NATURAL ORIGIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bartholdy-Consultadoria e Servicos Lda Avenida Arriaga 77, Edificio Marina Forum, 6º Andar, Sala 605, SE' Funchal / PT | [2007/45] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Bartholdy-Consultadoria e servicos Ltd Avenida Arriaga 77, Edificio Marina Forum, 60 Andar, Sala 605 P-SE'Funchal / PT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLPATO, Ivo Via C. Cattaneo, 22 I-06070 S. Mariano / IT | 02 /
BIZZINI, Bernard, Emile 65, rue du Roc F-81000 Albi / FR | 03 /
ABREU, Roberto, Carlos, c/o Bartholdy-Consultadoria E Servicos Ltd,Avenida Arriaga 77,Edi.Marina Forum 6° Andar, Sala 605 P-9000 FUNCHAL MADEIRA / PT | 04 /
LIPPMANN, Marco . 6957 Roveredo/Ti / CH | [2007/24] |
Former [2004/22] | 01 /
VOLPATO, Ivo Via C. Cattaneo, 22 I-06070 S. Mariano / IT | ||
02 /
BIZZINI, Bernard, Emile 65, rue du Roc F-81000 Albi / FR | |||
03 /
ABREU, Roberto, Carlos, c/o Bartholdy-Consultadoria E Servicos Ltd,Avenida Arriaga 77,Edi.Marina Forum 6 Andar, Sala 605 P-9000 FUNCHAL MADEIRA / PT | |||
04 /
LIPPMANN, Marco . 6957 Roveredo/Ti / CH | |||
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
VOLPATO, Ivo Via C. Cattaneo, 22 I-06070 S. Mariano / IT | ||
02 /
BIZZINI, Bernard, Emile 65, rue du Roc F-81000 Albi / FR | |||
03 /
ABREU, Roberto, Carlos Avenida Arriaga 77 P-9000 FUNCHAL MADEIRA / PT | |||
04 /
LIPPMANN, Marco . 6957 Roveredo/Ti / CH | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/13] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02748760.2 | 11.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP06371 | Priority number, date | IT2001MI01238 | 12.06.2001 Original published format: IT MI20011238 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02100440 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399192 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399192 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/57 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONJUGATE VON POLYMEREN NATÜRLICHEN URSPRUNGS | [2004/13] | English: | CONJUGATES OF POLYSACCHARIDE POLYMERS OF NATURAL ORIGIN | [2004/13] | French: | CONJUGUES DE POLYMERES DE POLYSACCHARIDE D'ORIGINE NATURELLE | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Request for further processing for: | 03.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.07.2006 | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | NL | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | SE | 07.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | IE | 11.06.2008 | LU | 11.06.2008 | GR | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2023/28] |
Former [2011/38] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 11.06.2008 | ||
GR | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
NL | 07.11.2007 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
SE | 07.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH03101618 ; | [X]GB816750 (CIBA LTD) [X] 1,28-31 * the whole document *; | [X]GB900803 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) [X] 1 * claim - *; | [X]WO9015628 (CETUS CORP [US]) [X] 1-37 * claim - *; | [X]DE4029374 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claim - *; | [X]WO9311803 (M U R S T [IT]) [X] 1-37 * claim - *; | [X]EP0611573 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL]) [X] 1-37 * claims 1,8 *; | [X]WO9738312 (SCRIPPS LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * claim - *; | [X] - KALPAXIS, D. L. ET AL, "Immobilization of hyaluronate on cellulose fibers and its use for the isolation of cartilage components", INT. J. BIOCHEM. (1985), 17(1), 61-6, XP001041420 [X] 1-37 * page 61, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0020-711X(85)90086-2 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 23, Database accession no. 1991-168375, XP002183306 & JPH03101618 A 19910426 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - EDWARDS, J. V., "Synthesis and formulation of covalently and ionically bound peptido- cellulose conjugates", BOOK OF ABSTRACTS, 215TH ACS NATIONAL MEETING, DALLAS, MARCH 29-APRIL 2 (1998), CELL-047 PUBLISHER: AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, D. C., XP001112977 [X] 1-37 * abstract * |