|
06.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
290 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
50 |
|
19.01.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
74 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
67 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
45 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2017 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
347 |
|
16.11.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
42 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.05.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2016 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
48 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
21.08.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
17.08.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
270 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
119 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
434 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
09.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.01.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
18.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
10 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
332 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
82 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2013 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
194 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
51 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
212 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
153 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
23.02.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2011 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
258 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
258 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.07.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.07.2011 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
503 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
09.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
610 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
364 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
386 |
|
14.05.2004 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
545 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
326 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
316 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
525 |
|
11.06.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
655 |