EP1409901 - BACK SEATING VALVE WITH SERVICE PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, OH 44124-4141 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | For all designated states Parker Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, OH 44124-4141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEARPASS, Gary, A. 602 Rt. 414 Clyde, NY 14433 / US | [2004/17] | Representative(s) | Pilch, Adam John Michael D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/17] | Pilch, Adam John Michael D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02752471.9 | 18.07.2002 | [2004/17] | WO2002US23023 | Priority number, date | US20010307782P | 25.07.2001 Original published format: US 307782 P | [2004/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010454 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1409901 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1409901 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/044, G01N1/20 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
F16K11/044 (EP,US);
F16K31/508 (EP,US);
F16K43/008 (EP,US);
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86895 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/50] |
Former [2004/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELSITZVENTIL MIT EINER WARTUNGSÖFFNUNG | [2004/17] | English: | BACK SEATING VALVE WITH SERVICE PORT | [2004/17] | French: | VANNE A PORTEE D'ETANCHEITE ARRIERE AVEC ORIFICE D'ENTRETIEN | [2004/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 21.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3777783 (BECK M) [X] 1-4,8-15 * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-12 * [A] 6; | [A]US4215714 (LAUE CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 4, lines 45-50; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19618272 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,12 * figures 2A,2B *; | [A]US4521948 (LAUE CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1,12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5120020 (LAUE CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5067521 (JENKS JAMES K [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3789881 (KOZULLA R, et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US3762443 (SORENSON G) [A] 1,12 * figures 21A-23 * |