EP1411878 - MEDICATION TRACKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2005 | Deletion: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | 11.10.2005 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 530 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 530 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLTE, Myles, Dean 405 Cool Springs Road Sanford, NC 27330 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02753433.8 | 02.08.2002 | [2004/18] | WO2002US24612 | Priority number, date | US20010309963P | 03.08.2001 Original published format: US 309963 P | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03013417 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1411878 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61M5/1415 (EP,US);
A61J1/1462 (EP,US);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
A61J2205/10 (EP,US);
A61J2205/60 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3546 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELN | [2004/18] | English: | MEDICATION TRACKING SYSTEM | [2004/18] | French: | SYSTEME DE SUIVI DE MEDICAMENTS | [2004/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 01.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5980501 (GRAY JOHN M [GB]); | [AX]US6032155 (DE LA HUERGA CARLOS [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 6 * * column 12, line 32 - line 58 * * figures 1-3B,13 * [X] 8,14,15,17-27; | [AX]WO0058901 (MONGRENIER JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1,6,8,14 * page 6, line 27 - line 40; figures 6,7 * [X] 19-27 | by applicant | US5561412 | US5699038 | US5838223 |