EP1415453 - EXTERNAL STORAGE FOR MODULAR COMPUTER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEFFERNAN, Peter 39 Nichol Road, Chandlers Ford Hampshire SO53 5AX / GB | 02 /
MAYHEAD, Martin, P. Tuscaloosa, Tilford Road Hindhead, Surrey GU26 6QY / GB | 03 /
GARNETT, PAUL, J. Little Orchard, Knightsbridge Road Camberley, Surrey GU15 3TS / GB | 04 /
KING, James, E. 75a Waterloo Road Wokingham, Berkshire RG40 2JE / GB | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Harris, Ian Richard D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02755140.7 | 09.08.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002GB03685 | Priority number, date | US20010311505P | 10.08.2001 Original published format: US 311505 P | GB20010019558 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0119558 | US20020366430P | 21.03.2002 Original published format: US 366430 P | GB20020006719 | 21.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0206719 | US20020143538 | 10.05.2002 Original published format: US 143538 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03014925 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1415453 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F13/00 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G06F3/0607 (EP);
G06F3/0661 (EP);
G06F3/0689 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERNES SPEICHERGERÄT FÜR MOLEKULARRECHNERSYSTEME | [2004/19] | English: | EXTERNAL STORAGE FOR MODULAR COMPUTER SYSTEMS | [2004/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE EXTERNE POUR SYSTEMES INFORMATIQUES MODULAIRES | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5809328 (NOGALES CHARLES EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-47* the whole document *; | [A]US5941972 (HOESE GEOFFREY B [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document *; | [X]US5991530 (OKADA TORU [JP], et al) [X] 24,25 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0106385 (NETCONVERGENCE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-47 * the whole document * | Examination | WO9957639 |