EP1415072 - AN EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATANI, Koichiro, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
HIROTA, Shinya, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
TOSHIOKA, Shunsuke, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
ITOH, Kazuhiro, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
ASANUMA, Takamitsu, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
KIMURA, Koichi, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
MIKAMI, Akira, C/O TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02755884.0 | 08.08.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002JP08142 | Priority number, date | JP20010241116 | 08.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001241116 | JP20010397474 | 27.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001397474 | JP20020015924 | 24.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002015924 | JP20020017375 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: JP 2002017375 | JP20020067286 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: JP 2002067286 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014539 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415072 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1415072 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/022, B01J35/04, F01N3/035, F01N3/08, F01N3/20 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
F01N3/022 (KR);
B28B11/006 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/035 (EP,US);
F01N3/0807 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0821 (EP,US);
F01N3/0835 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/085 (EP,US);
F01N3/0878 (EP,US);
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F01N3/2053 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
F02M26/32 (EP,US);
F01N2240/20 (EP,US);
F01N2260/14 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F02M26/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/42] |
Former [2004/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/19] | English: | AN EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION DEVICE | [2004/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF EPURATEUR DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 15.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]JPH1099648 ; | [A]JP2000303878 ; | [Y]US4283210 (MOCHIDA SHIGERU, et al) [Y] 4,5 * abstract *; | [A]US4695301 (OKAJIMA ATUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4718926 (NAKAMOTO MITSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,32 * abstract *; | [A]DE4002649 (INTERATOM [DE]) [A] 32 * abstract *; | [A]WO9422556 (STOBBE PER [DK]); | [YA]WO0112320 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 7,11,16,17,25,26,28 * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 13; figure . * [A] 9,10; | [Y]US2001002538 (KATSUTA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 31 * column 5, paragraph 67; figure 4 * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10099648 A 19980421 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1,2,6 * abstract * [A] 32 [Y] 4,5,7,11,16,17,25,26,28,31 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000303878 A 20001031 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 29 * abstract * |