|
18.10.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
26 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
26 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
26 |
|
04.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
08.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2018 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
20 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
19 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2017 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
20 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2017 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.05.2017 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Request concerning representative opponent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
36 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2015 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Observations by third parties |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
33 |
|
09.07.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
06.06.2012 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2012 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.05.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.01.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
15.11.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
03.09.2010 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.08.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
50 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
45 |
|
24.08.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
58 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
58 |
|
11.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
21 |
|
28.04.2010 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
23.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.03.2010 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2010 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.12.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.11.2009 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2009 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.10.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Description |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.12.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
77 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
77 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
62 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
62 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
229 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
229 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
229 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.02.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
31 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
65 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
73 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
89 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
49 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
78 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
41 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
50 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
89 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
41 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
73 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
65 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
30.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
49 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
49 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.05.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
07.04.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.09.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.09.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
06.09.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
01.09.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.03.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.02.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
23 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |