EP1488425 - INEXACT ADDRESSABLE DIGITAL MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cogniscience Limited Incubator Building, Grafton Street Manchester M13 9XX / GB | [2006/27] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Cogniscience Limited Incubator Building, Grafton Street Manchester M13 9XX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURBER, Stephen Byram 1A Gorsey Road Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 5DU / GB | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2004/52] | Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 02767715.2 | 14.10.2002 | [2004/52] | WO2002GB04650 | Priority number, date | GB20020007372 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0207372 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03083669 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1488425 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488425 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/10, G06F12/02, G06F15/18 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G11C8/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNSCHARF ADRESSIERBARER DIGITALER SPEICHER | [2004/52] | English: | INEXACT ADDRESSABLE DIGITAL MEMORY | [2004/52] | French: | MEMOIRE NUMERIQUE A L'ADRESSAGE INEXACT | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.01.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2006 | BE | 05.07.2006 | CH | 05.07.2006 | CY | 05.07.2006 | CZ | 05.07.2006 | EE | 05.07.2006 | FI | 05.07.2006 | LI | 05.07.2006 | NL | 05.07.2006 | SK | 05.07.2006 | TR | 05.07.2006 | BG | 05.10.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | SE | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | LU | 14.10.2006 | IE | 16.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
TR | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
LU | 14.10.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
IE | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.10.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9004830 (UNIV SPACE RES ASS [US]) [DA] 1,15,16,21 * page 24, line 1 - page 27, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0626650 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,15,16,21 * column 1, lines 9-39 *; | [A]US5457408 (LEUNG WAI-BOR [US]) [A] 1,15,16,21* column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 12; figure 4 *; | [A]US5829009 (FRAZIER GARY A [US]) [A] 1,15,16,21 * column 3, lines 1-24; figure 2 * |