|
06.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
03.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.11.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2017 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.10.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.05.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.04.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.2013 |
Confirmation of the receipt of third party observations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2013 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.11.2013 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.10.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
F3080 Communication regarding observations by third parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Non-patent Literature filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Patent document filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Patent document filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Patent document filed by a third party during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2013 |
Receipt of third party observations during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.06.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
22 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Opposition |
31 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2011 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
222 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.02.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2010 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2005 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.05.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.2003 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.05.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
36 |