EP1481114 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL PROCESSING OF MICROELECTRONIC WORKPIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMITOOL, INC. 655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell Montana 59901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states SEMITOOL, INC. 655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell, Montana 59901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSON, Kyle, M. Semitool, Inc. 655 West Reserve Drive Kalispell, MT 59901 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Armin Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Kühn, Armin Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02780265.1 | 03.09.2002 | [2004/49] | WO2002US28071 | Priority number, date | US20010316597P | 31.08.2001 Original published format: US 316597 P | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03018874 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1481114 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C25B11/00, C25B15/00, C25C7/02, C25D17/00, C25D17/10 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
C25D17/001 (EP,US);
C25D17/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN VERARBEITUNG VON MIKROELEKTRONISCHEN WERKSTÜCKEN | [2004/49] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ELECTROCHEMICAL PROCESSING OF MICROELECTRONIC WORKPIECES | [2004/49] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT ELECTROCHIMIQUE DE PIECES MICROELECTRONIQUES | [2004/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 26.09.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6179983 (REID JONATHAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17,29,30,34,35,37 * column 3, line 44 - column 7, line 51 * * figures 1-6 *; | [E]WO02097165 (SEMITOOL INC [US], et al) [E] 1,3,4,24,25,28-30* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4238310 (ECKLER THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US5256262 (BLOMSTERBERG KARL-INGEMAR [SE]) |