EP1437569 - THIN-FILM MICROMACHINE RESONATOR, THIN-FILM MICROMACHINE RESONATOR GYROSCOPE, NAVIGATION SYSTEM USING THE THIN-FILM MICROMACHINE RESONATOR GYROSCOPE, AND AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUCHI, Satoshi 11-10-203, Ichiriyama-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8002 / JP | 02 /
NOZOE, Toshiyuki 1-20, Imagumanominamihiyoshi-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0953 / JP | 03 /
NOMURA, Koji 2-22-13, Kitayamato Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0121 / JP | 04 /
TAJIKA, Hirofumi 1-6-5-1311, Tomobuchi-cho Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 534-0016 / JP | [2012/14] |
Former [2005/10] | 01 /
OUCHI, Satoshi 11-10-203, Ichiriyama-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8002 / JP | ||
02 /
NOZOE, Toshiyuki 1-20, Imagumanominamihiyoshi-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0953 / JP | |||
03 /
NOMURA, Koji 2-22-13, Kitayamato Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0121 / JP | |||
04 /
TAJIKA, Hirofumi 1-6-5-1311, Tomobuchi-cho, Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 534-0016 / JP | |||
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
OUCHI, Satoshi 11-10-203, Ichiriyama-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 663-8002 / JP | ||
02 /
NOZOE, Toshiyuki 1-20, Imagumanominamihiyoshi-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0953 / JP | |||
03 /
NOMURA, Koji 2-22-13, Kitayamato Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0121 / JP | |||
04 /
TAJIKA, Hirofumi 2-18-13-311, Takadono, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02783619.6 | 26.11.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002JP12310 | Priority number, date | JP20010360560 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001360560 | JP20020300116 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002300116 | [2004/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03052350 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437569 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437569 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/56, G01C21/00, H03H9/17, H01L41/08 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
G01C19/5607 (EP,US);
H03H9/21 (EP,US);
H03H9/2484 (EP,US);
H03H2003/0492 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/29] | G01C19/56, G01P9/04, G01C21/00, H03H9/17, H01L41/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2012/14] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIKROHERGETELLTER DÜNNFILMRESONATOR, MIKROHERGESTELLTER DÜNNFILMRESONATORKREISEL, NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM WELCHES DEN MIKROHERGESTELLTEN DÜNNFILMRESONATORKREISEL VERWENDERT, UND AUTOMOBIL | [2004/29] | English: | THIN-FILM MICROMACHINE RESONATOR, THIN-FILM MICROMACHINE RESONATOR GYROSCOPE, NAVIGATION SYSTEM USING THE THIN-FILM MICROMACHINE RESONATOR GYROSCOPE, AND AUTOMOBILE | [2004/29] | French: | RESONATEUR DE MICROMACHINE A FILM MINCE, GYROSCOPE DE RESONATEUR DE MICROMACHINE A FILM MINCE, SYSTEME DE NAVIGATION FAISANT APPEL A CE GYROSCOPE DE RESONATEUR DE MICROMACHINE A FILM MINCE ET AUTOMOBILE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2004 | Translation filed | 05.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4764244 (CHITTY GORDON W [US], et al); | [X]US2001010169 (WATARAI TAKEHIRO [JP]); | International search | [Y]JPS5549020 (SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS); | [A]JPS57160067 (BENDIX CORP); | [Y]JPH02218915 (NIPPON DENKI HOME ELECTRONICS); | [Y]JPH04504617 ; | [A]JPH05322579 (TAMAGAWA SEIKI CO LTD); | [A]US5438231 (KHOSHNEVISAN MOHSEN [US], et al); | [X]JPH085382 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [X]JPH09105634 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [Y]JPH09280868 (KINSEKI LTD); | [Y]JPH1019574 (NIKON CORP); | [X]JPH10339637 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) | by applicant | US5438231 |