|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
14.03.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.2012 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
10.12.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.10.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2011 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.04.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
17 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
04.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.08.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.11.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2006 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.04.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2003 |
Refund of fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.10.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2003 |
international preliminary examination report - Automated negative |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.09.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Written opinion - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
24 |
|
30.12.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
3 |