EP1391119 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR DATA RECORDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/09] | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR STREAM CONVERSION, A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR DATA RECORDING, AND DATA RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
[2006/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kazuhiko 35-53, Korigaoka 11-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0084 / JP | 02 /
YAHATA, Hiroshi 24-10, Shoji-cho, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0058 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Kojiro 1-46-1-607, Kisabenishi Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0041 / JP | 04 /
VAN GESTEL, Wilhelmus, Jacobus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
KELLY, Declan, Patrick Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
KATO, Motoki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
NAKAMURA, Masanobu, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/09] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kazuhiko 35-53, Korigaoka 11-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0084 / JP | ||
02 /
YAHATA, Hiroshi 2-2-2, Minamiterakata-Kitadori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0046 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASAKI, Kojiro 1-46-1-607, Kisabenishi Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0041 / JP | |||
04 /
VAN GESTEL, Wilhelmus, Jacobus Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
05 /
KELLY, Declan, Patrick Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | |||
06 /
KATO, Motoki, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | |||
07 /
NAKAMURA, Masanobu, c/o SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02785955.2 | 28.11.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002JP12414 | Priority number, date | JP20010367788 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001367788 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03047261 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391119 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391119 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N5/76, G11B20/10 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N5/92 (KR);
G11B20/10 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B27/00 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N21/23608 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4347 (EP,US);
H04N21/440218 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10814 (EP,US);
G11B2220/213 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2583 (EP,US);
G11B2220/61 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US);
H04N9/8205 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/22] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DATENAUFZEICHNEN | [2006/05] | English: | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR DATA RECORDING | [2006/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES | [2006/05] |
Former [2004/09] | "VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STREAM-UMSETZUNG, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DATENAUFZEICHNEN UND DATENAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM" | ||
Former [2004/09] | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR STREAM CONVERSION, A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR DATA RECORDING, AND DATA RECORDING MEDIUM | ||
Former [2004/09] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CONVERSION DE FLUX DE DONNEES, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | BE | 14.06.2006 | CH | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | EE | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | TR | 14.06.2006 | BG | 14.09.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | IE | 28.11.2006 | LU | 28.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
TR | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.11.2006 | ||
LU | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0843482 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11* abstract *; | [A]EP0899964 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0101] * * abstract *; | [A]US6236663 (KAWAKAMI SATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 9, lines 57-65 * * abstract *; | [A]US2001009548 (MORRIS OCTAVIUS J [GB]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0036] * * abstract *; | [PA]US6456783 (ANDO HIDEO [JP], et al) [PA] 1-11 * abstract * |