EP1448361 - EMBOSSED NON-WOVEN FABRIC HAVING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/31] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CASEY, William, A. 14 Stoneybrook Circle Andover, NA 01810 / US | 02 /
SUAREZ, Claudio Julian Balbin 2561 (1713) Parque Leloir Buenos Aires / AR | [2004/35] | Application number, filing date | 02790397.0 | 18.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002EP12903 | Priority number, date | AR20010005436 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: AR 0105436 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03043806 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1448361 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448361 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/435 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/64 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/12 (EP,KR,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,KR,US);
B31F2201/0733 (EP,KR,US);
B31F2201/0738 (EP,KR,US);
B31F2201/0784 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T156/1023 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/35] | B31F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEPRÄGTER VLIESSTOFF MIT DREIDIMENSIONALER STRUKTUR | [2004/35] | English: | EMBOSSED NON-WOVEN FABRIC HAVING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURE | [2004/35] | French: | ETOFFE NAPPEE GAUFREE A STRUCTURE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 12.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Bierbaum Unternehmensgruppe GmbH & Co. KG Gelsenkirchener Strasse 11 46325 Borken / DE Opponent's representative Tönhardt, Marion, et al, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Bierbaum Unternehmensgruppe GmbH & Co. KG Gelsenkirchener Strasse 11 46325 Borken / DE Opponent's representative Tönhardt, Marion, et al, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | 06.06.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.12.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.10.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/12] | 20.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.11.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | GB | 02.08.2006 | IE | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | AT | 18.11.2006 | LU | 18.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
LU | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
GB | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 02.08.2006 | |
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3616157 (SMITH J HAROLD) [A] 1-22 * figure - *; | [A]US3717532 (KAMP E) [A] 1-22 * figures 1-6 *; | [DA]EP0810078 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1-22* the whole document *; | [DA]DE19725749 (HCD GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-22 * the whole document * |