EP1456107 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FOLDED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITT, Patrick, Otmar Königshofer Pfad 5 97253 Rittershausen / DE | 02 /
WANDER, Stefan Hans-Böhm-Str. 7 97264 Helmstadt / DE | [2004/38] | Application number, filing date | 02792665.8 | 17.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002DE04611 | Priority number, date | DE2001163211 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10163211 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03055777 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456107 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456107 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
B65H45/221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/26] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FALZPRODUKTEN | [2004/38] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FOLDED PRODUCTS | [2004/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS PLIES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | IE | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | AT | 17.12.2010 | GB | 17.12.2010 | LU | 17.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | FR | 03.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 17.12.2010 | ||
GB | 17.12.2010 | ||
LU | 17.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 17.12.2010 | ||
GB | 17.12.2010 | ||
LU | 17.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 30.06.2010 | |
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 17.12.2010 | ||
GB | 17.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
AT | 17.12.2010 | ||
GB | 17.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
GB | 17.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IE | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CZ | 30.06.2010 | |
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | EE | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | SE | 30.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4671501 (FUJISHIRO YUJI [JP]) [A] 1,2,6 * column 11, line 38 - column 12, line 43; figures 20,21 *; | [DA]DE4128797 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,6* column 2, line 14 - line 43; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2510057 | DE3237504 | DE4137818 | DE4128797 | DE4430693 |