|
02.08.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.07.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
4 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.06.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.05.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.05.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.05.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2014 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2014 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.01.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
101 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
07.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
07.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
07.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.07.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.12.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
76 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
101 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2010 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
98 |
|
07.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2004 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
117 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.04.2003 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
77 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |