EP1448877 - AUTOMOTIVE COOLANT CONTROL VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranco Incorporated of Delaware 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1704 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Ranco Incorporated of Delaware, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue - Suite 1704 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Invensys Climate Controls 8115 US Route 42 North Plain City, OH 43064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLANE, Allan c/o Invensys Climate C. 8115 US Route 42 North Plain City OH 43064 / US | 02 /
KRAMER, William, D. 2461 Carriage Rd. Powell, OH 43065 / US | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
MCLANE, Allan 6318 Wismer Circle Dublin, OH 43016 / US | ||
02 /
KRAMER, William, D. 2461 Carriage Rd. Powell, OH 43065 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02795680.4 | 26.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US37924 | Priority number, date | US20010997118 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: US 997118 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03046342 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448877 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448877 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, F16K11/085 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
F01P7/167 (EP,US);
B60H1/00485 (EP,US);
F16K11/0856 (EP,US);
F01P11/029 (EP,US);
F01P2007/146 (EP,US);
F01P2060/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLMITTELSTEUERVENTIL FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2004/35] | English: | AUTOMOTIVE COOLANT CONTROL VALVE | [2004/35] | French: | VANNE DE COMMANDE DE LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR AUTOMOBILE | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2008 | BE | 02.01.2008 | CH | 02.01.2008 | CY | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | EE | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | LI | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | SK | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | BG | 02.04.2008 | SE | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | ES | 13.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
SE | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
BE | 02.01.2008 | ||
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CH | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 02.01.2008 | |
LI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
ES | 13.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2905158 (LACEFIELD ARLIE G, et al) [A] 1,10,11 * figure - *; | [A]US5131431 (VULLMAHN ANDREW G [US]) [A] 7,16* column 2, line 57 - line 65; figure - *; | [XA]EP0639736 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,9,11,12 * abstract * [A] 15; | [A]FR2800125 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [A] 1,6,11,15,18,19 * abstract *; | [XA]US6230668 (MARSH GREGORY ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11 * column 3, line 35 - column 11, line 35; figure - * [A] 2-5,13,14,18,19; | [XPA]EP1197644 (RENAULT [FR]) [XP] 1,2,6 * column 7, line 24 - line 52; figure - * [A] 11,12,14 |