EP1440092 - PHOTOACTIVATABLE COMPOSITION AND THE USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2014/51] |
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIC, Gabin 835 rue de la République F-60280 Venette / FR | 02 /
LIVOREIL, Aude 16, rue Dragon F-75006 Paris / FR | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/31] | 01 /
VIC, Gabin 12 rue Rhin et Danube F-60200 Compiegne / FR | ||
02 /
LIVOREIL, Aude 16, rue Dragon F-75006 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [2012/03] |
Former [2004/31] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02796824.7 | 23.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002FR03632 | Priority number, date | FR20010013970 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0113970 | [2004/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03037830 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1440092 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440092 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/03] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1440092 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/64, A61Q5/00, A61Q17/00 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K38/38 (EP,US);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (EP,US);
A61K8/494 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP,US);
C07K14/77 (EP,US);
A61K2800/434 (EP,US);
A61K2800/81 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/31] | C07K14/77, A61K38/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOAKTIVIERBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2004/31] | English: | PHOTOACTIVATABLE COMPOSITION AND THE USE OF SAME | [2004/31] | French: | COMPOSITION PHOTOACTIVABLE ET UTILISATIONS | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 14.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Kuhnert, Oliver, et al, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Patente (VLI) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2012/47] | 22.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.04.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.05.2014 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.09.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 28.03.2014 | Appeal received No. T0771/14 | 21.05.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | IE | 18.01.2012 | IT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | LU | 23.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 18.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 18.01.2012 | |
BG | 18.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2605220 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [DA] 1,18,23,24* the whole document * | by applicant | FR2605220 | US5211942 | WO9317060 | WO9612754 | EP1152013 | - D.A.TOMALIA ET AL., ANGEWANDLTE CHEMIE, INT.ENGL. ED., vol. 29, no. 2, pages 138 - 175 | Opposition | US4695285 | WO0106829 |