EP1468412 - CADENCE-PROVIDING DRUM PRACTICE PAD ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagastegui, John 2334 Ave. Marejada San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 02797453.4 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/43] | WO2002US40928 | Priority number, date | US20010032182 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: US 32182 | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03102899 | Date: | 11.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468412 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09B15/00, G10H3/14, G10H1/00, G10D13/00 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
G10H1/0016 (EP,US);
G10D13/03 (EP,US);
G10H1/40 (EP,US);
G10H3/146 (EP,US);
G10H2220/046 (EP,US);
G10H2230/281 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/43] | G09B15/00, G10H3/14, G10H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROMMELÜBUNGSPADBAUGRUPPE MIT KADENZBEREITSTELLUNG | [2004/43] | English: | CADENCE-PROVIDING DRUM PRACTICE PAD ASSEMBLY | [2004/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE TAMPON DE PRATIQUE DE TAMBOUR DONNANT LE RYTHME | [2004/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 03.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5385076 (BELLI REMO D [US]) [X] 19,21-24 * abstract * * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 2; figure 2 * [Y] 20,25,26; | [Y]US5739457 (DEVECKA JOHN R [US]) [Y] 25,26 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 34 - line 41 *; | [X]EP0945848 (ROLAND MEINL MUSIKINSTRUMENTE [DE]) [X] 19* abstract *; | [Y]US6063992 (SCHWAGERL RICHARD P [US]) [Y] 20 * abstract * | International search | [XY]DE4041766 (KOLLER ROMAN [DE]) [X] 1,20,21 * figures 1,8 * * abstract * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 26 * * column 16, line 62 - column 1732 * * claim 1 * [Y] 2-17; | [Y]US4679479 (KOYAMATO HISAKAZU [JP]) [Y] 2-17 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5739457 (DEVECKA JOHN R [US]) [X] 1,20,21 * figure A * * figures 1,5,6 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 41 * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 34 * * column 9, line 38 - line 64 * [A] 2-17; | [XA]EP0731432 (COMUS SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * figure - * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 17 * [A] 2-17,20,21; | [XA]US4207087 (BAER RALPH H [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figures 1,5,6 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 41 * * column 4, line 59 - column 6, line 34 * * column 9, line 38 - line 64 * [A] 4-17,20,21; | [X]EP1029566 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,20,21 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0010] *; | [A]US4919030 (PERRON III MARIUS R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 45 * |