blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1420663

EP1420663 - METHOD FOR A HAIR COLOUR CONSULTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  19.12.2008
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2008Revocation of patentpublished on 21.01.2009  [2009/04]
19.12.2008New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wella Aktiengesellschaft
Berliner Allee 65
64274 Darmstadt / DE
[2004/22]
Inventor(s)01 / FERTIG, Werner
Gärtnerweg 8
64625 Bensheim / DE
02 / MATTINGER, Detlef
Am Mühlgraben 5
64404 Bickenbach / DE
03 / UHL, Stefan
Pulverhäuser Weg 82
64295 Darmstadt / DE
 [2004/22]
Representative(s)Herzog, Martin, et al
KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis
PartGmbB
Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/07]Herzog, Martin, et al
KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63
40024 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date02797653.930.08.2002
[2004/22]
WO2002EP09685
Priority number, dateDE200114252630.08.2001         Original published format: DE 10142526
[2004/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO03020072
Date:13.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1420663
Date:26.05.2004
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2004/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1420663
Date:09.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:A45D44/00
[2004/22]
CPC:
G01J3/526 (EP,US); A45D19/0066 (EP,US); A45D44/005 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,US); A45D2044/007 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2004/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN FÜR EINE HAARFARBBERATUNG[2004/22]
English:METHOD FOR A HAIR COLOUR CONSULTATION[2004/22]
French:PROCEDE POUR UN CONSEIL EN COULEUR DE CHEVEUX[2004/22]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2003National basic fee paid 
04.12.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2003Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.2003Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/22]
18.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2004Fee for grant paid
22.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05002497.5  / EP1527713
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.11.2005  17.11.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Dokter, Eric-Michael
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/28]
Opponent(s)01  04.11.2005  17.11.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Dokter, Eric-Michael
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2005/52]
Opponent(s)01  04.11.2005   
HENKEL KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Dokter, Eric-Michael
Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 6
D-80538 München / DE
14.12.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.03.2007Date of oral proceedings
12.04.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.04.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.11.2008Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/04]
06.11.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.06.2007Appeal received No.  T1010/07
10.08.2007Statement of grounds filed
06.11.2008Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
06.11.2008Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
EE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
TR09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
PT09.07.2005
AT30.08.2005
CY30.08.2005
BE31.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
[2008/04]
Former [2007/30]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
EE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
TR09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
AT30.08.2005
CY30.08.2005
BE31.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
CH31.08.2006
LI31.08.2006
Former [2007/20]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
EE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
TR09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
AT30.08.2005
CY30.08.2005
BE31.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
Former [2007/11]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
EE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
TR09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
AT30.08.2005
BE31.08.2005
LU31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
Former [2006/52]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
TR09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
AT30.08.2005
BE31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
Former [2006/36]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
BE31.08.2005
MC31.08.2005
Former [2006/28]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
MC31.08.2005
Former [2006/22]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2006/15]BG09.02.2005
CZ09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2006/14]BG09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2006/13]BG09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
IE09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2006/12]BG09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2006/01]BG09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
SK09.02.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2005/48]BG09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2005/46]BG09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
Former [2005/30]BG09.02.2005
Cited inInternational search[A]US4297724  (MASUDA TATSUNOSUKE, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4731743  (BLANCATO VITO [US]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *;
 [A]WO0132051  (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [PAD]EP1147722  (KAO CORP [JP]) [PAD] 1-8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.