|
25.04.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
17.11.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.06.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Request for change of name |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.05.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.02.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2008 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.06.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
45 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.12.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
10.06.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Refund of fees (PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.03.2003 |
International preliminary examination report - Automated |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
08.03.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
08.03.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
23.09.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |