EP1322488 - HARDTOP VEHICLE ROOF WITH AT LEAST TWO RIGID ROOF PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/27] | HARDTOP VEHICLE ROOF WITH AT LEAST TWO RIGID ROOF PARTS- | ||
[2004/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Fahrzeug-Dachsysteme GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 59 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2005/28] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states CTS Fahrzeug-Dachsysteme GmbH Am Radeland 125 21079 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPENDORF, Marcus Elserring 31 74354 Besigheim / DE | 02 /
HAHN, Gerald Cuxhavener Strasse 176 21149 Hamburg / DE | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Müller, Gottfried, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Müller, Gottfried, et al Wittner & Müller Patentanwälte Am Ochsenberg 16 73614 Schorndorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02800602.1 | 07.10.2002 | [2003/27] | WO2002EP11208 | Priority number, date | DE2001149456 | 08.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10149456 | [2003/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031213 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322488 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1322488 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/14, B60J7/20 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B60J7/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/32] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | HARDTOP-FAHRZEUGDACH MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI STARREN DACHTEILEN | [2003/27] | English: | HARDTOP VEHICLE ROOF WITH AT LEAST TWO RIGID ROOF PARTS | [2004/32] | French: | TOIT DE VEHICULE DE TYPE TOIT AMOVIBLE COMPRENANT AU MOINS DEUX PARTIES DE TOIT RIGIDES | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/27] | HARDTOP VEHICLE ROOF WITH AT LEAST TWO RIGID ROOF PARTS- | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.08.2004 | GB | 04.08.2004 | IT | 04.08.2004 | [2007/39] |
Former [2006/32] | FR | 04.08.2004 | |
GB | 04.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | GB | 04.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE19846006 (EDSCHA CABRIO VERDECKSYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 4, line 63 - column 4, line 22 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 8,11; | [PX]DE10059342 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-11 * column 1, line 42 - column 1, line 65 * * column 2, line 25 - column 2, line 33 * * column 4, line 5 - column 4, line 25 * * column 4, line 50 - column 4, line 55 * * abstract *; | [DA]EP0835779 (KARMANN GMBH W [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 6 * * abstract * | Examination | WO03024731 | by applicant | EP0835779 |