|
19.01.2012 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
18.11.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.08.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.07.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
26.07.2011 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.2011 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.06.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.01.2011 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.08.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.05.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2006 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2006 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
11 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.03.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.01.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
20.12.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.04.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |