EP1446733 - GLYCOSYLPHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL CONTAINING POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asterion Limited Firth Court, Western Bank Sheffield S10 2TN / GB | [2009/37] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Asterion Limited Firth Court, Western Bank Sheffield S10 2TN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSS, Richard University of Sheffield Room 112 Floor M Royal Hallamshire Hospital Glossop Road Sheffield S10 2JF GB / GB | [2009/35] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
ROSS, Richard Chemical Sciences, Northern General Hospital Sheffield S5 7ALL / GB | Representative(s) | Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Gilholm Harrison Ltd Marlborough House Westminster Place York Business Park Nether Poppleton, York YO26 6RW / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Boakes, Jason Carrington Harrison Goddard Foote 31 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02801405.8 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002GB04665 | Priority number, date | GB20010024620 | 13.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0124620 | GB20020000904 | 16.01.2002 Original published format: GB 0200904 | GB20020018889 | 14.08.2002 Original published format: GB 0218889 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03034275 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1446733 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446733 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, C07K14/72 | [2009/12] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2009/08] | C12N15/62 | ||
Former IPC [2004/34] | G06F17/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLYKOSYLPHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOLHALTIGE POLYPEPTIDE | [2004/34] | English: | GLYCOSYLPHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL CONTAINING POLYPEPTIDES | [2004/34] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES CONTENANT DU GLYCOSYLPHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.11.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.09.2009 | EE | 09.09.2009 | SK | 09.09.2009 | BG | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/15] |
Former [2010/25] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
SK | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 09.09.2009 | |
EE | 09.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 09.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9900423 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,12-18,20-25,27,28 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, line 21 - line 29 * * page 21, line 17 - line 20 * * page 24, line 33 *; | [X]EP0976764 (CHUGAI RES INST MOLECULAR MED [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,12-18,21,23,24,28 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 46 *; | [X]WO0056862 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [X] 9-27 * page 3 - page 7; figure 2 *; | [YD] - ROSS R J M ET AL, "A short isoform of the human growth hormone receptor functions as a dominant negative inhibitor of the full-length receptor and generates large amounts of binding protein", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (1997), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0888-8809, pages 265 - 273, XP002181691 [YD] 5,6,9-11 * page 269, column 2 - page 271, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.11.3.265 | [Y] - DA COSTA CLIVE R ET AL, "Production of the thyrotrophin receptor extracellular domain as a glycosylphosphatidylinositol-anchored membrane protein and its interaction with thyrotrophin and autoantibodies.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19980508), vol. 273, no. 19, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 11874 - 11880, XP002246413 [Y] 5,6,9-11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.19.11874 | [A] - MAAMRA MABROUKA ET AL, "Studies with a growth hormone antagonist and dual-fluorescent confocal microscopy demonstrate that the full-length human growth hormone receptor, but not the truncated isoform, is very rapidly internalized independent of Jak2-Stat5 signaling.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19990521), vol. 274, no. 21, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 14791 - 14798, XP002246414 [A] 1,28 * page 14791, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.21.14791 | [A] - R.A. MEYERS (ED.), Molecular Biology and Biotechnology. A comprehensive desk reference, NEW YORK, US, VCH PUBLISHERS, INC., (1995), XP002246550 [A] 1-28 * page 200 - page 204 * * page 392 - page 397 * * page 474 - page 476 * * page 789 - page 793 * | Examination | EP1081224 |