|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
05.10.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.10.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.09.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.2007 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.2007 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.2007 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.04.2006 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
09.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
08.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.03.2004 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2004 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
22.12.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.12.2003 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
19.12.2003 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2003 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |