EP1451284 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING COATED BLEACH ACTIVATOR GRANULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSMANN, Georg Dechant-Königs-Str. 9 41363 Jüchen / DE | 02 /
BLOCHWITZ, Olaf, Joachim Rathenower Heerstrasse 42 39307 Genthin / DE | 03 /
SPECKMANN, Horst-Dieter Eichenfeldstrasse 24a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 04 /
POETHKOW, Jörg Macherscheiderstrasse 24 41468 Neuss / DE | 05 /
MIDDELHAUVE, Birgit Robert-Koch-Str. 24 40789 Monheim / DE | 06 /
BLASEY, Gerhard Fürstenberger Strasse 21 40599 Düsseldorf / DE | [2004/36] | Application number, filing date | 02804191.1 | 22.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002EP13127 | Priority number, date | DE2001159388 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10159388 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048290 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451284 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451284 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39, C11D11/00, C11D17/00 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
C11D3/3925 (EP,US);
C11D11/0088 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON UMHÜLLTEN BLEICHAKTIVATORGRANULATEN | [2004/36] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING COATED BLEACH ACTIVATOR GRANULES | [2004/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GRANULES ENROBES ACTIVATEURS DE BLANCHIMENT | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 28.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.05.2006 | CZ | 03.05.2006 | EE | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | IE | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | SK | 03.05.2006 | TR | 03.05.2006 | BG | 03.08.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | AT | 22.11.2006 | LU | 22.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | CH | 30.11.2006 | LI | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
TR | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
AT | 22.11.2006 | ||
LU | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
BG | 03.08.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
AT | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
EE | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
AT | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
AT | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
AT | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
CH | 30.11.2006 | ||
LI | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CZ | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 03.05.2006 | ||
SK | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 03.05.2006 | |
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9914296 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6-8 * examples 1,2; claim - *; | [DA]WO0050556 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1,6-8* claim - *; | [PX]WO0212426 (HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLCHAFT AU [DE], et al) [PX] 1,5-12 * page 11, line 7 - line 29 * * page 12, line 11 - line 18; claim - *; | [PX]WO0226927 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1,5-8,12 * page 5, line 5 - line 30 * * page 6, line 26 - line 33; example 4 * |