|
12.12.2022 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2022 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
14.04.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
30.03.2022 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.02.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
605 |
|
19.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
86 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
12.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.10.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.08.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.07.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
22.10.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
95 |
|
19.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2020 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
16.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2020 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
24.01.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.05.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.05.2019 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.01.2018 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.09.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
29 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
135 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Sequence listing |
Appeal |
34 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.03.2014 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Annex |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.03.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
177 |
|
04.03.2013 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.2012 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
88 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
50 |
|
17.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
33 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
163 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
10.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.12.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.12.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2005 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2005 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
185 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2004 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
177 |
|
19.03.2004 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
116 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
34 |