|
09.10.2012 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
31.08.2012 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.07.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2012 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.02.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Annex |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
10 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.02.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2010 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2010 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2010 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2008 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |