EP1343247 - Turbine generating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-Cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2007/21] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Higashikawasaki-Cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Kazuya 659-754, Futamata, Hiraoka-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawamura, Masahide 2-32-2204, Kawasaki-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Noro, Osamu 2-17-18, Takaoka, Okubo-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Fujii, Tatsuo 6-6-5-106, Takenodai, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/37] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03003600.8 | 17.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | JP20020040639 | 18.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002040639 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1343247 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1343247 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1343247 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/04, H02P9/08 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
H02P9/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | H02P9/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/37] | Title | German: | Turbinen Generator Vorrichtung | [2003/37] | English: | Turbine generating apparatus | [2003/37] | French: | Appareil de génération à turbine | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.2007 | BE | 23.05.2007 | CH | 23.05.2007 | CY | 23.05.2007 | CZ | 23.05.2007 | DK | 23.05.2007 | EE | 23.05.2007 | FI | 23.05.2007 | IT | 23.05.2007 | LI | 23.05.2007 | NL | 23.05.2007 | SI | 23.05.2007 | SK | 23.05.2007 | TR | 23.05.2007 | BG | 23.08.2007 | GR | 24.08.2007 | ES | 03.09.2007 | PT | 23.10.2007 | HU | 24.11.2007 | LU | 17.02.2008 | IE | 18.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
HU | 24.11.2007 | ||
LU | 17.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
LU | 17.02.2008 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CY | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
EE | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
IE | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
IT | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
GR | 24.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SK | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
PT | 23.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
NL | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
BG | 23.08.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
DK | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
SI | 23.05.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
BE | 23.05.2007 | ||
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 23.05.2007 | |
CH | 23.05.2007 | ||
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 23.05.2007 | |
FI | 23.05.2007 | ||
LI | 23.05.2007 | ||
ES | 03.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 03.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH1182064 ; | [A]JPH11257017 ; | [YD]EP0963035 (CAPSTONE TURBINE CORP [US]) [YD] 1-19 * paragraph [0016] * * figure 3 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11082064 A 19990326 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [Y] - GATTI E ET AL, "Digital control of load commutated inverters for starting equipment of gas turbine power stations", FIFTH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS AND APPLICATIONS (CONF. PUBL. NO.377) IEE LONDON, UK, (1993), pages 250 - 255 vol.8, XP002309233 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11257017 A 19990921 (HITACHI LTD; HITACHI ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * abstract * |