|
11.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
26.07.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.03.2011 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.01.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.01.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2011 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.08.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.06.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.03.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
56 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
07.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2005 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
09.11.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |