EP1367664 - Bipolar plate comprising polypropylene as polymer binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/49] | Bipolar plate for electrochemical cell | ||
[2006/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGL Carbon AG Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states SGL Carbon AG Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states SGL CARBON AG Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Alwin Tannenweg 7 97084 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
Von Ganski, Albin Kornfeld 22 86647 Buttenwiesen / DE | 03 /
Hagenbach, Thomas Burgunderstrasse 18 4051 Basel / CH | [2003/49] | Application number, filing date | 03008343.0 | 10.04.2003 | [2003/49] | Priority number, date | DE2002116306 | 14.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10216306 | [2003/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1367664 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1367664 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367664 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
H01M8/04074 (EP,US);
B29C45/0013 (EP,US);
B29C45/2708 (EP,US);
B29C45/40 (EP,US);
H01M8/0213 (EP,US);
H01M8/0221 (EP,US);
H01M8/0226 (EP,US);
H01M8/0247 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (EP);
H01M8/026 (EP,US);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/2483 (EP);
B29C2045/2714 (EP,US);
B29C45/1657 (EP,US);
B29L2031/3468 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/24] | H01M8/02, B29C45/40, B29C45/28, H01M8/24 | ||
Former IPC [2003/49] | H01M8/02, B29C45/40, B29C45/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | Graphithaltige Bipolarplatte mit Polypropylen als Polymerbinder | [2006/32] | English: | Bipolar plate comprising polypropylene as polymer binder | [2006/32] | French: | Plaque bipolaire ayant polypropylène comme liant polymère | [2006/32] |
Former [2003/49] | Bipolarplatte für eine elektrochemische Zelle | ||
Former [2003/49] | Bipolar plate for electrochemical cell | ||
Former [2003/49] | Plaque bipolaire pour cellule électrochimique | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 18.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.02.2007 | CZ | 28.02.2007 | EE | 28.02.2007 | IE | 28.02.2007 | RO | 28.02.2007 | SI | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | TR | 28.02.2007 | LU | 10.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 29.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | HU | 01.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 28.02.2007 | |
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
LU | 10.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 28.02.2007 | |
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
IE | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | SI | 28.02.2007 | |
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | SI | 28.02.2007 | |
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | BG | 29.05.2007 | |
SE | 31.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0153592 (KOEPPERN & CO KG MASCHF [DE]) [X] 15-17 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 5 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH05104592 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 21,22 * abstract *; | [X]US5429492 (TANIYAMA YOSHIHIKO [US]) [X] 15,21 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 54 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]JPH11291296 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 13-18 * abstract *; | [Y]US6086643 (CLARK DUNCAN GUY [GB], et al) [Y] 6,44 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0041260 (BALLARD POWER SYSTEMS [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,20,24-36,46-49 * page 22, line 25 - page 23, line 13 * * page 25, lines 20-27 * * page 29, lines 3-32 * * page 36, lines 8-25 * * figures 2D,3,4 * [Y] 6; | [A]WO0044005 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,4,8-10,24-36,48-50 * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 5 * * page 11, lines 29-37 *; | [AD]US6180275 (BRAUN JAMES C [US], et al) [AD] 1,4,8-10,24-36,48-50 * column 1, lines 29-52 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, lines 48,49 * * column 5, lines 43-45 * * column 6, lines 5-29 *; | [XY]WO0180339 (NEDSTACK HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [X] 37-41,43 * pages 2-4 * [Y] 44; | [XY]US2001035595 (GEMBERLING GEORGE J [US]) [X] 37-42 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0027] - [0029] * * figures 2,4,5 * [Y] 44; | [A]EP1160900 (RIKEN KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,26-36 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0031] , [0032] * * figures 3,4 *; | [XY]FR2810795 (TECHNICATOME [FR]) [X] 37-42,46,47 * pages 5-6 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 44; | [A]US2002005508 (BUTLER KURT I [US], et al) [A] 1-50 * paragraphs [0003] , [0015] , [0027] , [0032] - [0034] - [0085] , [0143] - [0145] ** figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]WO0209220 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-50 * page 17, line 15 - page 19, line 30 *; | [A]EP1178498 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-50 * paragraphs [0069] - [0072] * * figures 11-13 *; | [E]EP1317009 (KRAUSS MAFFEI KUNSTSTOFFTECH [DE]) [E] 13 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0014] - [0016] * * figures 1,2 * |