EP1466657 - Filter device having more than one filtration compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16 Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16, Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16, Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dannenmaier, Jürgen Grünewaldstrasse 88 DE 72336 Balingen / DE | 02 /
Pirner, Manfred Graf-Friedrich-Weg 35 DE 72379 Hechingen / DE | 03 /
Goehl, Hermann Rosengarten 2 DE 72406 Bisingen-Zimmern / DE | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson, et al Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/42] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03008465.1 | 11.04.2003 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466657 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1466657 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/58, B01D63/04, A61M1/16, B01D63/02, B01D65/00, B01D61/30 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
B01D63/04 (EP,US);
B01D61/243 (EP,KR,US);
B01D61/30 (EP,US);
B01D61/58 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,KR,US);
B01D65/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/42] | B01D61/58, B01D63/04, A61M1/16, B01D63/02, B01D65/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/42] | Title | German: | Filterapparat mit mehr als einer Filtrationskammer | [2004/42] | English: | Filter device having more than one filtration compartment | [2004/42] | French: | Dispositif de filtration avec plus d'une chambre à filtration | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 30.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/25] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 04.05.2009 | ||
[2012/32] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.04.2003 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | MC | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | IE | 11.04.2013 | LU | 11.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 11.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
MC | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2506626 (INPHARDIAL SPA [IT]); | [X]DE3326704 (MAGASI JOSEF); | [XY]EP0264695 (MAGASI JOSEF); | [X]US4861485 (FECONDINI LUCIANO [IT]); | [X]EP0890368 (SIS TER SPA [IT]); | [DX]US5882516 (GROSS ARNOLD [DE], et al); | [Y]US6074559 (HAHMANN UWE [DE], et al); | [A]WO0044478 (GAMBRO DIALYSATOREN [DE], et al) | Examination | FR2231421 | US4211597 | US4343668 |