|
17.02.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.06.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.03.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.08.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2011 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.07.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
59 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.02.2009 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2008 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2007 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2005 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2005 |
Request for change of name |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2004 |
Declaration that a search is not possible |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2003 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2003 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
28.05.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
27.05.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
29.04.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |