EP1372095 - Relay of application events as instant messages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Communications, Inc. 900 Broken Sound Parkway Boca Raton, FL 33287 / US | [2006/11] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Siemens Information and Communication Networks Inc. 900 Broken Sound Parkway Boca Raton, FL 33487-3587 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyda, William J. 21580 Edward Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Berg, Peter European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/51] | Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011266.8 | 16.05.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | US20020167362 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: US 167362 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372095 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04M3/537 (EP,US);
H04L51/224 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4536 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/37] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Weitergabe von Softwareanwendungsereignissen als Echtzeitnachrichten | [2003/51] | English: | Relay of application events as instant messages | [2003/51] | French: | Relais des évènements d'applications en tant que messages instantanés | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.02.2006 | 13.01.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/23] | 04.02.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/23] | 14.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5748884 (ROYCE KEVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15,16 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - line 52 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 13 * * column 12, line 18 - line 54 *[A] 12-14; | [XY]EP0948160 (SIEMENS INF & COMM NETWORKS [US]) [X] 1-10,15,16 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0026] * * figure 1 * [Y] 11-14; | [Y]US6301609 (ARAVAMUDAN MURALI [US], et al) [Y] 11-14 * column 2, line 14 - line 31 * * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 24 * |