EP1376079 - Method for detecting air-delivered underwater bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 28305 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 28305 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bülow, Heiko Am Grashof 40 28355 Bremen / DE | 02 /
Wicker, Kai, Dr. Upper Borg 61 A 28357 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Neumeister, Dirk, Dr. Vahrer Strasse 174 28309 Bremen / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Wasiljeff, Johannes M.B. Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Otto-Lilienthal-Strasse 25 28199 Bremen / DE | [2012/07] |
Former [2008/50] | Wasiljeff, Johannes M.B. Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Patentanwälte Otto-Lilienthal-Strasse 25 28199 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03011292.4 | 17.05.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE2002128681 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10228681 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376079 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376079 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376079 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, G01H3/00, B63G8/39, B63G9/02 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
G01V1/001 (EP);
B63G8/39 (EP);
B63G9/02 (EP);
G01H3/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | G01H3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Detektieren von luftverbrachten Unterwasserlaufkörpern | [2011/42] | English: | Method for detecting air-delivered underwater bodies | [2004/01] | French: | Procédé pour le détection de corps sous-marins immergés depuis l'air | [2004/01] |
Former [2004/01] | Verfahren zum Detektieren von Luftverbrachten Unterwasserlaufkörpern | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.05.2003 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | IE | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | AT | 17.05.2012 | LU | 17.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
AT | 17.05.2012 | ||
LU | 17.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
AT | 17.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 15.02.2012 | |
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4604610 (BAKER ROBERT W [CA], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 51 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0535570 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 30 * * page 7, line 5 - line 10 * * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 7 *; | [A]DE4220429 (ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5563580 (STEPHENS JAMES O [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5959534 (CAMPBELL STEPHEN HAROLD [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [PA]DE10128973 (STN ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X] - AUSTIN JOSEPH, "Modern Torpedoes and countermeasures", vol. 3(4), (20010117), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://www.bharat-rakshak.com/MONITOR/ISSUE3-4/joseph.html, XP002475370 [X] 1 * the whole document * * page 6, paragraph 2 * | [L] - SHI SHENG-GUO ET AL, "Experimental investigation of the splash sound of low-speed body water entry", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. E2005149025592, XP002475240 [L] 1-15 * abstract * | [ ] - HARBIN GONGCHENG DAXUE XUEBAO; HARBIN GONGCHENG DAXUE XUEBAO/JOURNAL OF HARBIN ENGINEERING UNIVERSITY DECEMBER 2004, (200412), vol. 25, no. SUPPL., pages 99 - 102 |