EP1388323 - Dynamic stabilising arrangement for bones, in particular for the spinal column [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIEDERMANN MOTECH GmbH Bertha-von-Suttner-Strasse 23 78054 VS-Schwenningen / DE | [2007/02] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states BIEDERMANN MOTECH GmbH Berta-von-Suttner-Strasse 23 78054 VS-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biedermann, Lutz am Schäfersteig 8 78048 VS-Villingen / DE | 02 /
Jeszensky, Dezsö Spisergasse 11 9000 St. Gallen / DE | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Hofer, Dorothea, et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Hofer, Dorothea, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012088.5 | 28.05.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | DE2002136691 | 09.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10236691 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388323 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388323 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/7035 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/7008 (EP,US);
A61B17/702 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2004/45] |
Former [2004/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dynamische Stabilisierungseinrichtung für Knochen, insbesondere für Wirbel | [2004/07] | English: | Dynamic stabilising arrangement for bones, in particular for the spinal column | [2004/07] | French: | Dispositif de stabilisation dynamique pour les os, notamment pour la colonne vertébrale | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.06.2006 | 20.06.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.06.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE2821678 (SULZER AG) [Y] 10 * column 7 - column 8; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,6,8,11; | [X]SU848009 (NII TRAVMATOLOGII ORTOPEDII [SU]) [X] 1,2,6,8,9,11 * Derwents Zusammenfassung, Figur *; | [YA]FR2717370 (MOREAU PATRICE [FR], et al) [Y] 10 * page 6 - page 8; figure 5 *[A] 1,6,8,11; | [XY]US5733284 (MARTIN JEAN-RAYMOND [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-9,11 * column 4 - column 6; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5,10; | [YA]WO0108574 (BIEDERMANN LUTZ [DE], et al) [Y] 4,5 * Zusammenfassung *;; figures 1,2 * [A] 11 | Examination | WO9632071 | WO0015125 |