EP1371852 - Hermetic compressor lubrication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY 100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states TECUMSEH PRODUCTS COMPANY 100 East Patterson Street Tecumseh Michigan 49286 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREIMANN, Nelik I. 10987 Tipton Highway Tipton, Michigan 49287 / US | 02 /
BUNCH, Rick L. 417 Wildwood Circle Tecumseh, Michigan 49296 / US | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 03012996.9 | 10.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | US20020166646 | 11.06.2002 Original published format: US 166646 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1371852 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1371852 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04C23/00, F04C29/02, F04C18/356 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
F04C28/28 (EP,US);
F04C18/3564 (EP,US);
F04C23/001 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F04C29/025 (EP,US);
F04C29/028 (EP,US);
F04C29/126 (EP,US);
F16K15/063 (US);
Y10S417/902 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7927 (EP);
Y10T137/7929 (EP);
Y10T137/7935 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7936 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/17] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmierungsanlage für einen hermetischen Verdichter | [2003/51] | English: | Hermetic compressor lubrication system | [2003/51] | French: | Système de lubrification pour compresseurs hermétiques | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09329093 ; | [A]JPS61268890 ; | [A]JPH10288178 ; | [A]JPH0242192 ; | [A]DE853459 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5022146 (GANNAWAY EDWIN L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5533875 (CRUM DANIEL R [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6171076 (GANNAWAY EDWIN L [US]) [A] 1 * figure 18 *; | [X]US6312233 (AHN BYUNG HA [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 56 - line 62; figures 4A,4B * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09329093 A 19971222 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870422), vol. 011, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 583), & JP61268890 A 19861128 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10288178 A 19981027 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900425), vol. 014, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 0966), & JP02042192 A 19900213 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPS63223377 |