EP1376277 - Method for actuating a holding brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2008/03] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerner, Norbert Zachersdorfstrasse 45 83374 Traunwalchen / DE | 02 /
Kohler, Frieder Zeller Strasse 5 83362 Lauter / DE | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 03013531.3 | 13.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | DE2002129350 | 29.06.2002 Original published format: DE 10229350 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376277 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1376277 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G05B13/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betätigen einer Haltebremse | [2004/01] | English: | Method for actuating a holding brake | [2004/01] | French: | Procédé d'actionnement de frein d'arrêt | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 02.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.01.2008 | CZ | 16.01.2008 | DK | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | FI | 16.01.2008 | IE | 16.01.2008 | NL | 16.01.2008 | RO | 16.01.2008 | SI | 16.01.2008 | SK | 16.01.2008 | TR | 16.01.2008 | BG | 16.04.2008 | SE | 16.04.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | AT | 13.06.2008 | LU | 13.06.2008 | PT | 16.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | HU | 17.07.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
TR | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 13.06.2008 | ||
LU | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 13.06.2008 | ||
LU | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
HU | 17.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 13.06.2008 | ||
LU | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
AT | 13.06.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 16.01.2008 | |
CZ | 16.01.2008 | ||
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 16.01.2008 | |
DK | 16.01.2008 | ||
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
RO | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
SK | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 16.01.2008 | |
FI | 16.01.2008 | ||
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
SE | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
SI | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
PT | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 16.01.2008 | |
NL | 16.01.2008 | ||
BG | 16.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 16.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5144213 (SASAKI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]WO9905578 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 1 - page 4 *; | [XDY]JP2000047732 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5; | [Y]US6317637 (LIMROTH JOHN [US]) [Y] 2-5 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 16 * |