EP1354652 - Distributor device for use in metal casting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pyrotek Engineering Materials Limited Garamonde Drive Wymbush Milton Keynes MK8 8LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Pyrotek Engineering Materials Limited Garamonde Drive Wymbush, Milton Keynes MK8 8LN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tremblay, Sylvain 3824 De Vienne Jonquiere Quebec G7X 9S3 / CA | 02 /
Vincent, Mark 19 Hydrus Road Leighton Buzzard LU7 8UL / GB | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Midsummer House, 413 Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 03013924.0 | 04.08.2000 | [2003/43] | Priority number, date | GB19990018350 | 05.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9918350 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1354652 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1354652 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1354652 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B22D35/04, B22D41/50, C22B21/06, B22D11/10, B22D7/12, B22D11/103, B22D11/119 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
B22D41/003 (EP,US);
B22C9/082 (EP,US);
B22D11/103 (EP,US);
B22D11/119 (EP,US);
B22D35/04 (EP,US);
B22D41/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/43] | B22D35/04, B22D41/50, C22B21/06, B22D11/10, B22D7/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/43] | Title | German: | Verteilervorrichtung zur Verwendung beim Metallgiessen | [2003/43] | English: | Distributor device for use in metal casting | [2003/43] | French: | Répartiteur utilisé dans la coulée de métaux | [2004/30] |
Former [2003/43] | Dispositif de distribution utilisé dans la coulée de métaux | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 25.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00953275.5 / EP1198314 | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.12.2004 | CH | 08.12.2004 | IT | 08.12.2004 | LI | 08.12.2004 | ES | 19.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | CY | 04.08.2005 | IE | 04.08.2005 | LU | 04.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/39] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
IT | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
CY | 04.08.2005 | ||
IE | 04.08.2005 | ||
LU | 04.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
CY | 04.08.2005 | ||
IE | 04.08.2005 | ||
LU | 04.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
CY | 04.08.2005 | ||
IE | 04.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 04.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 04.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
LI | 08.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]SU980938 ; | [XY]US2757425 (DUNCAN GEORGE S, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 75 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-6,11-13,15,16; | [Y]US3111732 (SCHROER CHARLES A, et al) [Y] 2-6,12,13,15,16 * column 5, line 22 - line 31; figures 2,3 *; | [XA]US3654150 (ECCLES ANTHONY GARTH) [X] 1-3,5,16,17 * column 10, line 20 - line 71; figure 7 * [A] 14; | [Y]US4834876 (WALKER NICHOLAS G [US]) [Y] 11 * abstract *; | [A]US5244032 (BANKSDEN DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * figures 5-7; claims 1-10 *; | [AP]WO9944719 (PROD IND DE HAUTE TEMPERATURE [CA]) [AP] 1-17* figure 9; claims 8-12 *; | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 41, Database accession no. 1983-787914, XP002258870 & SU980938 A 19821215 (CHIZHIKOV A I) [X] 1,5,10 * abstract * [Y] 2-4,6,11-13,15,16 |