|
16.04.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.04.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.01.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.05.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2005 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2005 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
14.07.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.07.2003 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
20 |