EP1427066 - Electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CA.TO.BO. S.n.c. di Cavalleretti Lavia & Tondelloni Daniele Via Cesare Sarti, 30 43029 Traversetolo (Parma) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states CA.TO.BO. S.n.c. di Cavalleretti Lavia & Tondelloni Daniele Via Cesare Sarti, 30 43029 Traversetolo (Parma) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tondelloni, Daniele Via Partigiani d'Italia, 18 43029 Traversetolo (Parma) / IT | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro, 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Gotra, Stefano Bugnion S.p.A. Via Garibaldi 22 43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 03017051.8 | 28.07.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | IT2002PR00011U | 29.11.2002 Original published format: IT PR20020011 U | IT2003PR00003U | 18.04.2003 Original published format: IT PR20030003 U | [2004/24] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427066 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/58 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
H01R13/5841 (EP);
H01R13/74 (EP);
H01R35/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder | [2004/24] | English: | Electrical connector | [2004/24] | French: | Connecteur électrique | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4708663 (ECKART GEORGE R [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10-12,14,15* column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US6338645 (TAN TANG YEW [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 27 - column 6; figures 6-8A; claim 24 *; | [X]GB2371152 (VOLEX GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1,8,10-12 * page 3, line 1 - line 19; figures 1-1B * |