blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1389528

EP1389528 - Cartridge and recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  25.03.2022
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.12.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2022Revocation of patentpublished on 27.04.2022  [2022/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/43]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Former [2004/08]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Asauchi, Noboru, Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi
Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP
 [2004/08]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/08]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date03017625.911.08.2003
[2004/08]
Priority number, dateJP2002023469612.08.2002         Original published format: JP 2002234696
[2004/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1389528
Date:18.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1389528
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.12.2003
ClassificationIPC:B41J2/175
[2004/08]
CPC:
B41J2/17546 (EP,US); B41J2/175 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2004/08]
TitleGerman:Patrone und Aufzeichnungsgerät[2004/08]
English:Cartridge and recording apparatus[2004/08]
French:Cartouche et appareil d'enregistrement[2004/08]
Examination procedure17.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
26.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2006Fee for grant paid
11.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 100411
51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/03]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, et al, et al
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Kierdorf Ritschel
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Sattlerweg 14
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2015/49]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, et al, et al
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Opponent's representative
Kierdorf Ritschel
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Sattlerweg 14
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2014/32]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, et al, et al
Widenmayerstrasse 48
80538 München / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2009/52]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells LLP Kennedydamm 24
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2009/33]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2009/32]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2008/02]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  05.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2007/41]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  DEEMED NOT TO HAVE BEEN FILED
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.07.2007  04.09.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2007/36]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007   
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  25.07.2007   
Artech GmbH
Feldbachacker 10
44149 Dortmund / DE
Former [2007/35]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.2007   
Pelikan Hardcopy(International) AG
Gewerbestrasse 9
8132 Egg / CH
Opponent's representative
Fähndrich, Martin, et al, et al
Lovells Kennedydamm 17
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
14.12.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.04.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.11.2009Date of oral proceedings
11.01.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2017Reply to a communication from the opposition division
14.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
27.12.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.11.2020Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.11.2020Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.04.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.12.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
17.12.2021Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/17]
Appeal following opposition16.03.2010Appeal received No.  T0592/10
21.05.2010Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
19.03.2010Appeal received No.  T0592/10
12.05.2010Statement of grounds filed
10.12.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.01.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:25.02.2005Request for further processing filed
25.02.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.03.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
IT11.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
SE12.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NL01.03.2014
FR31.08.2015
DE01.03.2018
[2018/36]
Former [2016/36]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
IT11.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
SE12.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NL01.03.2014
FR31.08.2015
Former [2015/35]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
IT11.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
SE12.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NL01.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
IT11.08.2013
SE12.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NL01.03.2014
Former [2014/22]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
SE12.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NL01.03.2014
Former [2014/20]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
Former [2011/32]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/42]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
TR25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
IT11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/41]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
HU26.04.2007
GB11.08.2007
IT11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/38]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CY25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
GB11.08.2007
LU11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/10]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
EE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
GB11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2009/03]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
GB11.08.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/45]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
IE13.08.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2008/22]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
MC31.08.2007
Former [2007/46]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
SI25.10.2006
SK25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/41]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
RO25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/39]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
DK25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/36]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
CZ25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/31]AT25.10.2006
BE25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/27]AT25.10.2006
FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/25]FI25.10.2006
BG25.01.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9804414  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,14-21 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 15; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1000752  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]);
 [X]US6155664  (COOK WILLIAM PAUL [US]) [X] 1-11,13-21 * column 7, line 17 - line 65; figures 2,3 *;
 [XY]US6158850  (COOK WILLIAM PAUL [US]) [X] 1-11,14-21 * column 6, line 39 - line 53; figure 3; claims 14,24-26 * [Y] 12,13;
 [X]EP1114726  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-21 * paragraphs [0066] , [0067]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2001019343  (WALKER RAY A [US], et al) [A] 12,13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0045] , [0052] - [0056]; figures 1,8 *;
 [X]EP1136268  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11,14-21 * paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6302527  (WALKER RAY A [US]) [A] 12,13 * column A; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]US6312106  (WALKER RAY A [US]) [A] 12,13 * column 5, line 26 - column 8, line 22; figures 3-5 *;
 [X]EP1156490  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11,14-21 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]EP1164022  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 12,13 * column 5, line 26 - column 8, line 22; figures 3-5 *;
 [A]US2002057319  (SARUTA TOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11,13-21 * paragraphs [0080] , [0086] , [0091]; figures 1-4B *;
 [Y]EP1213148  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [Y] 12,13 * column A; figures 3,,6B,,13 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.